OR HB2226 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter 15, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter 15, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Department of Transportation from charging fee for issuing, renewing or replacing parking identification cards.
Title
Relating to parking identification cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 15, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Winters. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Carried over to 03-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |