OR HB2215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter 19, (2019 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter 19, (2019 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to rights of persons with mental illness committed to Oregon Health Authority, right to reasonable privacy and security in resting, sleeping, dressing, bathing, personal hygiene and toileting. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to personal privacy of persons with mental illness; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 19, (2019 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2019. |
2019-04-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Winters. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Carried over to 03-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Findley, Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 1--Stark. |
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading. |
2019-01-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |