OR HB2211 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 394, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Includes veteran who has 70 percent total disability rating and received discharge or release under other than dishonorable conditions as person who may apply to Oregon Business Development Department for loan approval. Includes disabled] veteran who has 70 percent total disability rating and received discharge or release under other than dishonorable conditions as person who may apply to Oregon Business Development Department for loan approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to persons with disabilities.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseChapter 394, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-06-17HouseGovernor signed.
2019-06-10SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60.
2019-05-29SenateThird reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-28SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-05-22SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-15SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-05-08SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2019-04-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-03-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Boles, Findley, Marsh, McLane, Smith DB, Sprenger.
2019-03-14HouseSecond reading.
2019-03-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2211
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2211/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2211/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2211/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2211/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2211/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2211/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28132
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=450004
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29633
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=470186
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472218

Bill Comments

feedback