OR HB2209 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 814, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 814, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires persons cultivating shellfish on public or private land to file annual report. Creates Oregon Shellfish Task Force on Shellfish]. Sunsets task force on date of convening of 2017 regular session of Legislative Assembly] December 31, 2016. Establishes pilot project to increase frequency of water quality monitoring and analysis in Tillamook Bay. Sunsets pilot project on July 1, 2017. Directs Oregon State University to conduct research activities related to shellfish. Sunsets research activities related to shellfish on July 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to shellfish; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Chapter 814, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015. |
2015-08-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Boquist, Thatcher; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Clem, Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-04-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |