OR HB2208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Business Development Department Unreinforced Masonry Seismic Safety Program to issue grants for improving seismic safety, stability and resiliency of qualifying unreinforced masonry and unreinforced concrete buildings. Establishes Oregon Business Development Department Unreinforced Masonry Seismic Safety Program to issue grants for improving seismic safety, stability and resiliency of qualifying unreinforced masonry and unreinforced concrete buildings. Specifies limits and conditions for grants. Establishes fund for program. Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds during biennium ending June 30, 2021, to finance program. Requires department to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2021, regarding operation of program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to seismic improvements to buildings; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |