OR HB2203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to develop and implement grant program to provide funding to Oregon counties for veterans' courts. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to operations of department. Requires department to submit report on findings by January 1, 2021.]
Title
Relating to veterans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |