OR HB2198 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 613, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Cannabis Commission for certain purposes, including determining possible framework for future governance of Oregon Medical Marijuana Program. Requires report to interim committees of health and judiciary on possible framework on or before December 15, 2017. Provides that certain marijuana grow sites may transfer up to 20 pounds of usable marijuana to marijuana processor or marijuana wholesaler licensed by Oregon Liquor Control Commission. Modifies provisions setting forth restrictions on number of mature marijuana plants and immature marijuana plants that medical marijuana grow sites may possess. Specifies that marijuana retailers and dispensaries may be located within 1,000 feet of school only if Oregon Liquor Control Commission determines that there is physical or geographic barrier capable of preventing children from traversing to premises of marijuana retailer or dispensary. Abolishes Advisory Committee on Medical Marijuana. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cannabis; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-10HouseChapter 613, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
2017-08-02HouseGovernor signed.
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2017-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2017-07-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-07-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lininger, Wilson. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Boone.
2017-07-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2017-06-28HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2017-06-28HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-06-21HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2017-06-02HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2017-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2017-05-30HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-05-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-04-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2198
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2198/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2198/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2198/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2198/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2198/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2198/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26221
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26575
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421393
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421906

Bill Comments

feedback