OR HB2195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Chapter 242, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Chapter 242, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs county to use proceeds acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens or in exchange for land originally acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens to refund county general fund. Directs county with population of less than 650,000, and permits county with population of 650,000 or more,] to use proceeds acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens or in exchange for land originally acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens to provide] refund county general fund. Directs county with population of 650,000 or more to use proceeds acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens or in exchange for land originally acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens to provide to youth and families with children housing placement and retention support services, rental assistance and low income housing. Permits county with population of 650,000 or more to convey real property acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens or in exchange for land originally acquired by foreclosure of delinquent tax liens.
Title
Relating to foreclosure of county tax lien on real property.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | House | Chapter 242, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Read, Smith. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 12--Barreto, Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Heard, Krieger, Post, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |