OR HB2193 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 312, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 312, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs electric companies, if authorized by Public Utility Commission, to procure one or more energy storage systems that have capacity to store specified amount of energy. Requires procurement to occur not later than January 1, 2020. Creates process for authorizing procurement of energy storage systems. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to energy storage; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Chapter 312, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 10, 2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Barreto, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Devlin. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Sprenger, Whitsett. |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |