OR HB2191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Chapter 22, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Chapter 22, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies definition of "agent" for career schools.
Title
Relating to agents of career schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Chapter 22, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-03-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Steiner Hayward. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-03-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 9--Conger, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Komp, McLane, Richardson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boone, Matthews, Weidner. |
2013-03-07 | House | Second reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-03-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |