OR HB2178 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 702, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 702, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Campaign Finance Reform to conduct analysis and determine best method to address campaign finance reforms. Requires campaign finance statement to be filed within two business days if single contribution of $2,500 or more is received or single expenditure of $2,500 or more is made during 14-day period immediately preceding election. Adjusts other filing deadlines for campaign finance statement.] Sunsets task force on July 2, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to campaign finance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 702, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Edwards. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Bentz, Nearman, Olson, Smith, Weidner; Excused, 2--Barker, Boone. |
2015-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-10 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2015-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |