OR HB2177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Chapter 8, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Chapter 8, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to provide Secretary of State with electronic records containing legal name, age, residence and citizenship information and electronic signature of each person who may qualify as elector as prescribed by secretary by rule. Directs secretary to register as elector each nonregistered person who is qualified to vote and to notify persons how to decline registration and how to adopt political party affiliation. Increases maximum number of electors in precinct from 5,000 to 10,000. Establishes July 1, 2015, as date for determination of total number of registered electors in this state for purpose of maintaining status as minor political party for 2016 general election. Prohibits public record disclosure of voter registration information for persons under 18 years of age who are registered to vote. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to elections; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Chapter 8, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2015. |
2015-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward, Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Motion to refer to committee on Judiciary to adopt - 2 amendment failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Motion to refer to committee on Rules to adopt - 6 amendment failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Kennemer. |
2015-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |