OR HB2176 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 215, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 215, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates minimum amount of fee added to judgment that includes monetary obligation that court or judicial branch is charged with collecting. Eliminates minimum amount of fee added to judgment that includes monetary obligation that court or judicial branch is charged with collecting. Modifies authority of Chief Justice of the Supreme Court with regard to waiver or suspension of certain fees by courts and commissions, departments and divisions in judicial branch. Clarifies provisions relating to prohibition of compromise of restitution or compensatory fine in criminal money judgment. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to collection of court-imposed financial obligations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 215, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 47; Excused, 12--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |