OR HB2175 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Chapter 284, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 9, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Chapter 284, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 9, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to potentially habituated wildlife; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to potentially habituated wildlife; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Cowan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Chapter 284, (2011 Laws): Effective date June 9, 2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-03 | President signed. | |
2011-06-02 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-24 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Barker, Bentz, Boone, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Kennemer, McLane, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Speaker Hanna; Excused, 1--Frederick. | |
2011-05-19 | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-05-18 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-05-12 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-05 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading. Carried by Cowan. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 10--Bentz, Boone, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Hicks, Krieger, Smith G., Thatcher, Weidner. | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-03-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-07 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |