OR HB2134 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definition of "tobacco products" for purpose of taxation to include electronic cigarettes and nicotine solution. Applies to distributions of tobacco products occurring on or after January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to taxation of products intended for nicotine consumption; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-04-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Revenue.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback