OR HB2120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that health professional regulatory boards have discretion to authorize licensees regulated by board to self-refer to impaired health professional program in which board participates.
Title
Relating to licensees who self-refer to the impaired health professional program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-02-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2013-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |