OR HB2120 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the registration of animal products with the State Department of Agriculture; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the registration of animal products with the State Department of Agriculture; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-03-30 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-03-23 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hb2100.dir/hb2120.intro.html |