OR HB2116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Help In Cutting Costs for Unusual Pharmaceuticals program in Oregon Health Authority to reimburse high costs incurred by persons in this state to purchase certain pharmaceutical products. Requires Department of Revenue to transfer specified amount of corporate excise taxes paid on Oregon sales of pharmaceutical products by pharmaceutical manufacturers doing business in Oregon to pay for administration of program.
Title
Relating to reducing the high costs of pharmaceutical products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2116 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2116/Introduced |