OR HB2113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 722, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 5, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 722, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 5, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public employee retirement; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to public employee retirement; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Chapter 722, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 5, 2011. | |
2011-08-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-07-19 | President signed. | |
2011-07-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith G.. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 4--Brewer, Conger, Hicks, Parrish. | |
2011-06-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-22 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-22 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-22 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-12 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |