OR HB2106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 432, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 432, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows dog training classes to be conducted in farm buildings existing on January 1, 2019, within counties that adopted marginal lands provisions. Allows counties to approve up to five additional one-year extensions of land use permits for residential development. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to land use; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 432, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Evans, Meek; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |