OR HB2089 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 31, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 31, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows liquor stores and distillery retail outlet agents to sell vermouth.
Title
Relating to vermouth sales by retail sellers of distilled liquor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 31, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Carried over to 05-02 by unanimous consent. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Smith G. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |