OR HB2084 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 482, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 482, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset date for Water Resources Department grant program for place-based integrated water resources strategies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to place-based integrated water resources strategies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 482, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2019. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Linthicum. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Carried over to 06-17 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |