OR HB2078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 156, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 156, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws related to boating safety education.
Title
Relating to boating safety education.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 156, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 2--Meek, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-03-05 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |