OR HB2076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 154, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 154, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires boat operators to remove or open devices used to drain water from boat before transporting boat within this state. Provides exceptions. Punishes failure to comply by maximum fine of $250. Requires person to cooperate with ordered decontamination process at aquatic invasive species check station. Punishes failure to cooperate with ordered decontamination process by maximum fine of $250. Authorizes peace officer to stop person transporting recreational or commercial watercraft and require person to drive to open aquatic invasive species check station within five miles of stop if peace officer has probable cause that person failed to stop at check station. Punishes failure to comply with peace officer's request by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to aquatic invasive species.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 154, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 46; Nays, 9--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Williamson, Zika; Excused, 5--Findley, Greenlick, Hayden, Keny-Guyer, Wallan. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Post, Rayfield, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Williamson, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Nearman, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |