OR HB2053 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 93, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 93, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies community plan requirements for Preschool Promise Program. Modifies community plan requirements for Preschool Promise Program. Removes provisions related to fiscal agents for multiple preschool providers and multiple infant and toddler care providers. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to early learning programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 93, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Weber. Passed. Ayes, 53; Absent, 1--Wallan; Excused, 5--Evans, Leif, Rayfield, Reardon, Zika. |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Early Childhood. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |