OR HB2041 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Certified Oregon Program in Oregon Business Development Department to certify for-profit and nonprofit businesses to use term "Certified Oregon" on products and labels, in advertising and media and for other purposes specified by rule. Establishes Certified Oregon Advisory Group to advise and make recommendations to department to implement program and certify businesses. Requires department and advisory group to report to Eightieth Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2019.
Title
Relating to program to certify use of Certified Oregon label.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |