OR HB2031 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Youth Authority to establish pilot project to implement intensive in-home services model that includes availability of residential treatment services for youth in juvenile justice system. Authorizes authority to contract with nonprofit entities to establish model and provide services. Requires authority to evaluate pilot project and report to Legislative Assembly on or before date of convening of 2017 regular session. Appropriates moneys to authority to establish pilot project. Sunsets June 30, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to services for youth in criminal justice system; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |