OR HB2020 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Joint Carbon Reduction Committee
Hearing: Mar 25 @ 5:00 pm in HR A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Carbon Policy Office within Oregon Department of Administrative Services and directs Director of Carbon Policy Office to adopt Oregon Climate Action Program by rule. Modifies statewide greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals. Establishes Joint Committee on Climate Action. Establishes purposes of Oregon Climate Action Program and provisions for investment of moneys received by state as proceeds from auctions conducted under program. Requires program to place cap on greenhouse gas emissions that are regulated emissions and provide market-based mechanism for covered entities to demonstrate compliance with program. Sets forth certain other requirements for program and for rules adopted by Director of Carbon Policy Office related to program. Establishes certain funds. Sets forth requirements for uses of moneys deposited in funds. Authorizes Public Utility Commission to allow rate or rate schedule to include differential rates or to reflect amounts for programs that enable public utilities to assist low-income residential customers. Transfers duties, functions and powers of Environmental Quality Commission and Department of Environmental Quality related to greenhouse gas reporting to Carbon Policy Office. Amends greenhouse gas reporting statute. Repeals Energy Facility Siting Council carbon dioxide emissions standards. Includes provisions for treatment of site certificate conditions affected by repeal of carbon dioxide emissions standards. Provides that provisions related to Carbon Policy Office, Oregon Climate Action Program, investment of certain moneys, Public Utility Commission, transfer of duties, and repeal of Energy Facility Siting Council carbon dioxide emissions standards become operative January 1, 2021. Provides for expedited review of certain questions on Act to Supreme Court upon petition by adversely affected party. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseWork Session scheduled.
2019-03-25HouseWork Session scheduled.
2019-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-11HouseInformational Meeting held.
2019-02-08HouseInformational Meeting held.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Carbon Reduction.
2019-02-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback