OR HB2020 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 362, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 362, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to convene committee to advise authority in adopting rules governing authority's on-site quality assessments of organizations that provide mental health or chemical dependency treatment.
Title
Relating to standards for health care providers serving members of coordinated care organizations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Jason Conger [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Sen. William Shields [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Chapter 362, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 13, 2013. |
2013-06-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Buckley, Gomberg. |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |