OR HB2017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority to study health care in this state. Requires report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to health care. Sunsets January 2, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2019-04-12HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2019-04-09HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Health Care.
2019-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback