OR HB2017 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Chapter 750, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies and adds laws related to transportation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to transportation; prescribing an effective date; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HouseChapter 750, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
2017-08-18HouseGovernor signed.
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist, Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Thatcher.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2017-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2017-07-06SenateReferred to Transportation Preservation and Modernization.
2017-07-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-07-05HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Bynum, Evans, Fahey, Meek, Smith DB, Smith G, Smith Warner.
2017-07-05HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G, Smith Warner.
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown, Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 20--Alonso Leon, Barreto, Buehler, Bynum, Evans, Fahey, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Meek, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Power, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone.
2017-07-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2017-07-01HouseWork Session held.
2017-06-08HouseInformational Meeting scheduled.
2017-06-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-06-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-06-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-05-31HouseInformational Meeting scheduled.
2017-03-03HouseReferred to Transportation Preservation and Modernization.
2017-03-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback