OR HB2017 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows elector who does not have valid Oregon driver license, driver permit or state identification card to update voter registration using electronic voter registration system by supplying last four digits of elector's Social Security number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electronic voter registration; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2013-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-03-04HouseReferred to Rules.
2013-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback