OR HB2016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 429, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 429, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public employer to grant reasonable paid time to public employee who is designated representative to engage in certain activities. Requires public employer, upon request by exclusive representative, to authorize release time to designated representative of exclusive representative. Authorizes public employer and exclusive representative to negotiate and enter into agreements regarding release time. Entitles designated representative to be restored to same position after conclusion of release time. Requires public employer to provide exclusive representative reasonable access to employees in appropriate bargaining unit. Requires employers to provide employee contact information to exclusive representative within certain time limits. Permits public employer to deduct dues, fees and assessments from salary and wages of public employee who has authorized deduction. Requires employer to pay amounts deducted to labor organization. Expands definition of "employment relations" to include labor organization access to represented employees. Makes certain activities, related to labor organization,] attempts to influence employee to resign from or decline membership , use of employer's electronic mail to discourage membership] in labor organization or to discourage authorization of deduction for payment to labor organization,] and employer's encouragement of employee to revoke authorization of deduction for payment to labor organization and provision of certain personally identifiable information about public employees within bargaining unit to entity other than exclusive representative,] unfair labor practices.
Title
Relating to collective bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 429, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Hansell. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Taken from 06-03 Calendar and placed on 06-04 Calendar by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 2--Clem, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |