OR HB2016 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 618, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 618, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to develop and implement statewide education plan for early childhood through post-secondary education students who are black or African-American or not covered by existing statewide education plan and have experienced disproportionate educational results. Directs department to form advisory group to advise regarding development and implementation of plan, grant awards and rulemaking. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to statewide education plans; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Chapter 618, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hack. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2015-06-16 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-05-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Education. |
2015-04-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |