OR HB2016 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies definition of "recreational purposes" for purpose of limiting liability of landowner that allows access to land for recreational purposes.
Title
Relating to limiting liability of landowner allowing access to land for specified purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Berger [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Jules Kopel-Bailey [D] | Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] |
Rep. Deborah Boone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |