OR HB2015 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates requirement that person provide proof of legal presence before Department of Transportation issues noncommercial driver license, noncommercial driver permit or identification card. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to documents issued by the Department of Transportation; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HousePassed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
2019-06-18HouseMotion to refer to Rules failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 38--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Helt, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson.
2019-06-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Hernandez, Alonso Leon.
2019-06-17HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-10HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-03HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2019-05-30HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-05-30HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-05-22HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback