OR HB2013 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 391, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to issue direct to retailer permit to eligible out-of-state manufacturer of malt beverages, wine or cider to allow manufacturer to sell at wholesale and transport malt beverages, wine or cider to specified licensees. Allows Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to issue direct to retailer permit to eligible out-of-state manufacturer of malt beverages, wine or cider to allow manufacturer to sell at wholesale and transport malt beverages, wine or cider to specified licensees. Allows specified licensees to purchase for sale at retail malt beverages, wine or cider from certain licensees and permit holders. Allows holder of direct shipper permit that is licensed to manufacture malt beverages in another state to deliver those malt beverages directly to resident in this state. Allows commission to refuse to issue license, permit or certificate, or issue restricted license, permit or certificate to applicant that has failed to comply with laws or rules regulating psilocybin, alcohol, alcohol taxes or marijuana. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alcohol; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04HouseChapter 391, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
2023-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2023-06-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-05-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Hieb; Excused, 1--Lively.
2023-05-16HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-05-12HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-08HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2023-05-08HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-04HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2023-04-12HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-04-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Economic Development and Small Business.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2013
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2013/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2013/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2013/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2013/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2013/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2013/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22811
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23387
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23782
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23967
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23968
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24262
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24747
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24891
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/64994
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263240
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263131
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268167
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267753
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268549
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268550
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269684
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269756
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269757
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77715
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77738
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78259
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78531
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272708
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273522
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273635
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79369
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79419
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79553
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80505
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35239
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35786
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=580229
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589006

Bill Comments

feedback