OR HB2013 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 728, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 728, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Early Learning Council and Department of Education to assist school districts in implementing process to assess children to determine their readiness for kindergarten.
Title
Relating to early learning; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Jessica Pederson [D] | Sen. Chris Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 728, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Bentz, Berger, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Unger. |
2013-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-11 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |