OR HB2011 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 186, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 186, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified professional regulatory boards to require persons authorized to practice professions regulated by board to complete cultural competency continuing education. Exempts from requirements persons who are retired or not actively practicing profession. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to cultural competency continuing education; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 186, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Boquist, Johnson, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |