OR HB2007 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 506, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 506, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to require implicit bias training for mortgage loan originators. Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to require implicit bias training for mortgage loan originators. Establishes Joint Task Force on Addressing Racial Disparities in Home Ownership. Requires task force to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2022. Appropriates moneys to Legislative Policy and Research Committee to compensate task force.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to addressing disparities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 506, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-17 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Post, Reschke, Wallan. |
2021-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |