OR HB2007 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city or county to review and decide on applications for certain housing developments containing affordable housing units within 100 days. Establishes standards of review for city or county decision on application for certain housing developments located within urban growth boundary. Directs Department of Land Conservation and Development to study housing development in cities. Amends definition of "needed housing." Prohibits local government from adopting standards regulating development of housing that discourage needed housing through designation of primarily residential neighborhood as national historic district or that reduce density of application if density applied for is below authorized density for zone. Prohibits city or county from prohibiting building duplex or accessory dwelling unit in area zoned for single-family dwellings located within urban growth boundary. Requires city and county to allow nonresidential place of worship to use real property for affordable housing. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |