OR HB2007 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deems establishment of lottery game retailer or applicant to be casino when 50 percent or more of net income of establishment is, or is projected to be, derived from sale of tickets or shares in lottery games.
Title
Relating to the Oregon State Lottery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |