OR HB2004 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to Rules by order of the President.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

During first nine months of occupancy, prohibits landlord from terminating month-to-month tenancy within 60 days of receiving from tenant request for repairs to correct certain building, health or housing code violation or unhabitable condition. Prohibits landlord from terminating month-to-month tenancy without cause after first six] nine months of occupancy except under certain circumstances with 90 days'] written notice and payment of amount equal to one month's periodic rent. Provides exception for certain tenancies for occupancy of dwelling unit in building or on property occupied by landlord as primary residence. Makes violation defense against action for possession by landlord. Requires fixed term tenancy to be at least six months in duration, unless tenant requests shorter term. Requires landlord to give tenant 90 days' notice that fixed term tenancy will terminate upon reaching expiration date or that tenant may renew fixed term tenancy by giving landlord 45 days' notice. If landlord fails to provide notice, requires fixed term tenancy to become month-to-month tenancy upon reaching specified ending date, unless tenant elects to terminate tenancy. Requires fixed term tenancy to become month-to-month tenancy upon reaching specific ending date, unless tenant elects to renew or terminate tenancy. Requires landlord to make tenant offer to renew fixed term tenancy.] Permits city or county to implement rent stabilization program for rental of dwelling units.] Prohibits landlord from increasing rent on more than one occasion during any 12-month period. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to residential tenancies; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2017-06-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng.)
2017-05-31SenateWork Session held.
2017-05-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-04-10SenateReferred to Human Services.
2017-04-05SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-04-04HouseThird reading. Carried by Power, Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 27--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 2--Boone, Clem.
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading.
2017-03-31HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2017-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2017-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2004
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2004/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2004/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2004/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2004/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2004/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24870
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=396994
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26237

Bill Comments

feedback