OR HB2002 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 608, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands laws regarding preservation of participating properties that are publicly supported housing. Requires owner of participating property to provide notice to Housing and Community Services Department and local governments two years prior to expiration of contract or withdrawal of participating property from publicly supported housing. Requires property owner who violates notice requirements to extend affordability restriction on participating property. Requires owner of participating property to provide department and local governments with opportunity to offer to purchase participating property. Requires owner of participating property subject to certain contracts to provide department and local governments with right of first refusal to purchase participating property. Establishes timelines and requirements for department and local governments to exercise opportunity to offer to purchase participating property and right of first refusal to purchase participating property. Authorizes civil action by person who suffers ascertainable loss or damage as result of property owner's failure to comply with laws. Appropriates additional moneys from General Fund to department for certain biennial expenses. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to preservation of housing; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-10HouseChapter 608, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
2017-08-02HouseGovernor signed.
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen.
2017-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2017-07-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-07-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Barreto; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barker, Smith DB.
2017-07-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-06-30HouseWork Session held.
2017-06-28HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2017-06-28HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-06-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2017-04-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2017-04-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2017-04-11HouseWork Session held.
2017-02-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2002
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2002/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2002/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2002/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2002/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2002/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2002/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25080
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26601
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421384
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421902

Bill Comments

feedback