OR HB2001 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - Chapter 445, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires school district that is making reductions in educator staff positions to retain teacher with less seniority if release of teacher would result in lesser proportion of teachers with cultural or linguistic expertise. Requires school district that is making reductions in educator staff positions to retain teacher with less seniority if teacher has more merit and if retention of teacher is necessary to maintain school district's diversity ratio] release of teacher would result in lesser proportion of teachers with cultural or linguistic expertise. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for the reduction of educator staff; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-27HouseChapter 445, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
2021-07-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-25SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-17SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr.
2021-06-16SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-16SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-08SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-05-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-05-25HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Evans.
2021-05-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 8--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Weber, Wright; Excused, 1--Hayden.
2021-05-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-21HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-30HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2021-04-15HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Education.
2021-01-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2001
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2001/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2001/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2001/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2001/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32044
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32610
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=524886
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32847
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531642

Bill Comments 750

feedback