OR HB2001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 639, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 639, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires cities with population greater than 10,000 or within Metro to allow duplexes in lands zoned for single-family dwellings within urban growth boundary. Requires cities with population greater than 10,000 or within Metro to allow duplexes in lands zoned for single-family dwellings within urban growth boundary. Requires Metro counties and cities and cities with population greater than 25,000 to allow middle housing in lands zoned for residential uses within urban growth boundary. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to draft model ordinances. Requires cities and counties to amend their comprehensive plan and land use regulations to conform with requirements or to directly apply model ordinance developed by commission. Appropriates moneys to Department of Land Conservation and Development to provide technical assistance to local governments in implementing middle housing regulations and to plan improvement of urban services supporting middle housing. Requires local governments to support density expectations with findings when updating regulations to accommodate housing need. Requires cities to include number of permits issued and units produced of accessory dwelling units and middle housing in report to Department of Land Conservation and Development. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to establish alternate approval standards for low-rise middle housing conversions. Requires department to report on rules and standards to an interim committee of the Legislative Assembly by January 1, 2020. Prohibits enforcement of new restrictions that would prohibit the construction of middle housing in governing documents for planned communities or instruments conveying] affecting title to real property. Prohibits conditioning approval of accessory dwelling unit within urban growth boundary on off-street parking availability or owner occupancy. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 639, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 9--Bentz, Hansell, Hass, Olsen, Prozanski, Riley, Taylor, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Motion to reconsider carried. Ayes, 22; Nays, 4--Bentz, Hansell, Olsen, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Burdick changed her vote from "aye" to "nay" and serve notice of possible reconsideration. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Bill failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Burdick, Hansell, Hass, Heard, Manning Jr, Olsen, Prozanski, Riley, Taylor, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Gelser. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Barker, Boshart Davis, Doherty, Drazan, Findley, Gorsek, Hayden, Holvey, Nathanson, Salinas, Smith G, Sollman, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilde, Witt; Excused, 1--Evans. |
2019-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |