OR HB2001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals statewide prohibition on city and county ordinances regulating rents. Permits city or county to adopt rent stabilization program with certain restrictions. Imposes moratorium on rent increases greater than five percent for residential tenancies, with exceptions. Sunsets moratorium on July 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to rent stabilization for residential tenancies; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2001 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2001/Introduced |