OK SB406 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB406
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - 2 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - 2 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; providing exemption for certain nonprofits. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax; providing exemption for certain nonprofits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2024-05-16 | House | Further conference granted, same conferees |
2024-04-11 | Senate | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Rader, Howard, Murdock, Pugh, Haste, Burns, Hicks |
2023-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bennett |
2023-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 |
2023-04-25 | House | General Order |
2023-04-20 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett |
2023-04-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB406 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Enacting clause restored