OK SB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB186
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; restoring certain rights to carry. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; restoring certain rights to carry. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Sen. Warren Hamilton [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB186 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom