OK SB1619 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - remove as principal author Representative Hickman and substitute with Representative Fisher
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; accommodation of facilities; codifcation; effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; accommodation of facilities; codifcation; effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-24 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23Senateremove as principal author Representative Hickman and substitute with Representative Fisher
2016-05-23Senateremove as coauthor Representative(s) Peterson
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Dahm
2016-05-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Brumbaugh
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Sykes
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Murphey
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Stanislawski
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by ODonnell
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Silk
2016-05-20Senatecoauthored by Allen
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Peterson
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Fisher
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Kern
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Bennett
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Faught
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Cleveland
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Ritze
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Brecheen
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Strohm
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Hickman (principal House author)
2016-05-19SenateAuthored by Senator Bingman
2016-05-19SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7010110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback